TN SB7051 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enhances the penalty for the offense of reckless endangerment when a person's reckless failure to render inoperable or safely secure or lock a firearm, results in a child under 13 years of age gaining possession of the firearm and committing an act of mass violence that injures or kills the child or another. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to offenses of mass violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | Senate | Lay on the Table |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB7080 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.