TN SB7003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Pub. Ch. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Literacy Success Act"; requires LEAs to provide foundational literacy skills instruction, provide reading interventions and supports, and administer universal reading screeners to students in kindergarten through grade three to improve reading proficiency. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to literacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09 Pub. Ch. 3
2021-02-09 Effective date(s) 02/03/2021
2021-02-03SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-01-27SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-01-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-01-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-01-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-01-21HousePassed H., Ayes 84, Nays 5, PNV 0
2021-01-21HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-01-21SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-01-21SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 3
2021-01-21SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0005)
2021-01-21SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 1/21/2021
2021-01-21SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-01-20SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 1/21/2021
2021-01-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-01-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 1/20/2021
2021-01-20SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-14SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB7002 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 3

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback