TN HB7002 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Literacy Success Act"; requires LEAs to provide foundational literacy skills instruction, provide reading interventions and supports, and administer universal reading screeners to students in kindergarten through grade three to improve reading proficiency. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to literacy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 3
2021-01-21HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-01-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar
2021-01-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021
2021-01-21HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021
2021-01-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations of Extraordinary Session for 1/20/2021
2021-01-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Government Operations of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HousePlaced on cal. Education 12 of Extraordinary Session for 1/20/2021
2021-01-20HouseP2C, ref. to Education 12 Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2021-01-19HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7003 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Pub. Ch. 3

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback