TN SB7002 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Lay on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the criminal offense of recklessly, by any means of communication, threatening to commit an act of mass violence; requires the court to determine whether a defendant charged with threatening to commit an act of mass violence is a threat to the public prior to release on bail. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3 and Title 40, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 3 and Title 40, Chapter 11, relative to mass violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | Senate | Lay on the Table |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 8/22/2023 |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-08-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB7016 (Crossfiled) 2023-08-28 - Withdrawn.