TN SB3823 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S.GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S.GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases the time within which a physician must examine a person who is detained in certain mental health treatment resources from "within six hours of arrival" to "within four hours of arrival." - Amends TCA Title 33.
Title
As introduced, decreases the time within which a physician must examine a person who is detained in certain mental health treatment resources from "within six hours of arrival" to "within four hours of arrival." - Amends TCA Title 33.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-03-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3841 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-08 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3823&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3823.pdf |