TN SB3803 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of human services to expend at least 2 percent of the Child Care and Development Funds block grant on activities to improve the quality of child care. - Amends TCA Section 71-3-502.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of human services to expend at least 2 percent of the Child Care and Development Funds block grant on activities to improve the quality of child care. - Amends TCA Section 71-3-502.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3931 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-23 - Assigned to s/c Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3803&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3803.pdf |