TN SB3669 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that no disciplinary action be taken against a law enforcement officer for a pursuit for an actual or suspected violator of a law or ordinance who flees from pursuit unless such pursuit violated pursuit policies established by the law enforcement agency that employed such law enforcement officer at the time of the pursuit. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 40 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, requires that no disciplinary action be taken against a law enforcement officer for a pursuit for an actual or suspected violator of a law or ordinance who flees from pursuit unless such pursuit violated pursuit policies established by the law enforcement agency that employed such law enforcement officer at the time of the pursuit. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 40 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3703 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3669&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3669.pdf |