TN SB3636 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a water utility district in the eastern portion of White County with over 1,000 customers to change the manner in which vacancies are filled and commissioners are selected. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a water utility district in the eastern portion of White County with over 1,000 customers to change the manner in which vacancies are filled and commissioners are selected. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 82.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3697 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-31 - Failed In s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3636&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3636.pdf |