TN SB3620 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, names pathway surrounding Tennessee Bicentennial Mall in honor of Andrea Conte.
Title
As enacted, names pathway surrounding Tennessee Bicentennial Mall in honor of Andrea Conte.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1007 | |
2012-05-01 | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 1 | |
2012-04-23 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3727 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 1007