TN SB3619 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-05 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-05 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes physical therapy, occupational therapy, and speech and language pathology services available as essential services under medical assistance on and after July 1, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, makes physical therapy, occupational therapy, and speech and language pathology services available as essential services under medical assistance on and after July 1, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-04 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-05 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/4/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/03/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/02/10 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm to 06/01/10 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in FW&M Com. to 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. for pass; ref to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-03-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3393 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010