TN SB3537 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies property that is excluded from being defined as a heliport in a tourist resort county is limited to private property used for the landing of a privately owned and operated helicopter for private non-commercial purposes. - Amends TCA Section 42-8-101.
Title
As enacted, clarifies property that is excluded from being defined as a heliport in a tourist resort county is limited to private property used for the landing of a privately owned and operated helicopter for private non-commercial purposes. - Amends TCA Section 42-8-101.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965 | |
2010-05-06 | Comp. HB subst. | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3225 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 965