TN HB3225 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 965
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 965
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies property that is excluded from being defined as a heliport in a tourist resort county is limited to private property used for the landing of a privately owned and operated helicopter for private non-commercial purposes. - Amends TCA Section 42-8-101.
Title
As enacted, clarifies property that is excluded from being defined as a heliport in a tourist resort county is limited to private property used for the landing of a privately owned and operated helicopter for private non-commercial purposes. - Amends TCA Section 42-8-101.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Pub. Ch. 965 | |
2010-06-07 | Effective date(s) 05/26/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-05-14 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-05-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-05-06 | Passed S., Ayes 27, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-06 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-04-15 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-04-12 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 1 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/08/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Rural Roads of TR for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Action Def. in s/c Rural Roads of TR to Call of the Chair | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on s/c cal Rural Roads of TR for 02/10/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to s/c Rural Roads of TR | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3537 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 965
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3225&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB3225.pdf |