TN SB3521 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from taxation property owned and operated by a nonprofit national guard association operating a group insurance trust. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, exempts from taxation property owned and operated by a nonprofit national guard association operating a group insurance trust. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3506 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3521&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3521.pdf |