TN SB3453 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEAs to provide 30 minute lunch period for students and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires LEAs to provide 30 minute lunch period for students and teachers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/05/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3484 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-07 - Failed for Lack of Second in: K-12 of ED
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3453&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3453.pdf |