TN SB3403 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 948
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 948
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, includes mini-trucks in the definition of medium-speed vehicles; allows mini-trucks to be titled and registered as medium-speed vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Section 55-50-102.
Title
As enacted, includes mini-trucks in the definition of medium-speed vehicles; allows mini-trucks to be titled and registered as medium-speed vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Section 55-50-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 948 | |
2012-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/12 | |
2012-05-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Transmitted to Gov. for action | |
2012-04-25 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-24 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-19 | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 2 | |
2012-04-19 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-09 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-04-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-04-05 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-03 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/5/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3504 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 948