TN SB3398 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1021
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1021
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, "American Prisoners of War Pathway," Shelby Street Bridge in Nashville.
Title
As enacted, "American Prisoners of War Pathway," Shelby Street Bridge in Nashville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - S. TRANS CONSENT: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1021 | |
2010-05-27 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1404) | |
2010-05-27 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/27/2010 | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to last cal. | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. Trans Consent cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3660 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1021