TN SB3317 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Labor & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Labor & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the commissioner to implement a program of state inspection for intrastate consumption of meat, poultry or meat and poultry products and, to the greatest extent possible, to utilize the services of licensed veterinarians under contract with the department to perform the inspections. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, directs the commissioner to implement a program of state inspection for intrastate consumption of meat, poultry or meat and poultry products and, to the greatest extent possible, to utilize the services of licensed veterinarians under contract with the department to perform the inspections. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3160 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-13 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3317&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB3317.pdf |