TN SB3298 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts health insurance entities from including state-mandated health benefits in accident and health policies provided to young adults and employees of small businesses, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, exempts health insurance entities from including state-mandated health benefits in accident and health policies provided to young adults and employees of small businesses, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3767 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Government Operations Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3298&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3298.pdf |