TN SB3294 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, includes the Pyramid in Memphis in the definition of a qualified public use facility for convention center and tourism financing. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, includes the Pyramid in Memphis in the definition of a qualified public use facility for convention center and tourism financing. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3914 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-28 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M