TN SB3287 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits traffic citations for failure to stop completely before turning right at an intersection based solely on evidence from surveillance cameras. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-198.
Title
As introduced, prohibits traffic citations for failure to stop completely before turning right at an intersection based solely on evidence from surveillance cameras. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-198.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3371 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Transportation Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3287&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3287.pdf |