TN SB3283 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for depreciation of repairs and for railway improvements when proceeds from sale of short-line railroads are deposited in transportation equity fund. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-207 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, provides for depreciation of repairs and for railway improvements when proceeds from sale of short-line railroads are deposited in transportation equity fund. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-207 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm. | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in S. Trans Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3960 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Public Safety of TR of Transportation Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3283&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3283.pdf |