TN SB3209 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Failed In S. Govt. Ops. Comm. Ayes 4, Nays 0 PNV 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Failed In S. Govt. Ops. Comm. Ayes 4, Nays 0 PNV 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds implementation of the Long-Term Care Choices Act of 2008 to the required duties of the commission on aging and disability and requires the commission to report annually on such activities to the select oversight committee on long-term care. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 13; Title 33; Title 34; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, adds implementation of the Long-Term Care Choices Act of 2008 to the required duties of the commission on aging and disability and requires the commission to report annually on such activities to the select oversight committee on long-term care. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 13; Title 33; Title 34; Title 49; Title 55; Title 56; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Failed In S. Govt. Ops. Comm. Ayes 4, Nays 0 PNV 4 | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 2 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/21/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/19/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/12/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 3/17/2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S.GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3529 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-08 - Held on desk.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3209&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3209.pdf |