TN SB3197 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifically adds to the offense of unlawful gratuity or compensation the receiving, consent to receiving, or agreeing to receive property or a thing of value or of personal advantage for procuring a loan for another person. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Title
As introduced, specifically adds to the offense of unlawful gratuity or compensation the receiving, consent to receiving, or agreeing to receive property or a thing of value or of personal advantage for procuring a loan for another person. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-03-30 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 10 | |
2010-03-29 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3771 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-30 - Failed In s/c Utilities & Banking of COM of Commerce Committee