TN SB3177 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the Health-Care Choice Act. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, enacts the Health-Care Choice Act. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-03-29 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/29/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2417 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM of Commerce Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3177&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3177.pdf |