TN SB3137 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, grants authority to the comptroller to audit the books of the public defenders conference, post-conviction defender, and administrative office of the courts pertaining to payment of funds for indigent defendants. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 8; Title 40, Chapter 30, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 14, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, grants authority to the comptroller to audit the books of the public defenders conference, post-conviction defender, and administrative office of the courts pertaining to payment of funds for indigent defendants. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 16, Chapter 3, Part 8; Title 40, Chapter 30, Part 2 and Title 40, Chapter 14, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3199 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3137&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3137.pdf |