TN SB3126 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of environment and conservation to provide planning models for relocating, hauling, composting, or other processing of yard waste and food waste and to submit a report to the house conservation and environment committee and the senate environment, conservation, and tourism committee by December 1, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 202; Title 68, Chapter 211 and Title 68, Chapter 212.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of environment and conservation to provide planning models for relocating, hauling, composting, or other processing of yard waste and food waste and to submit a report to the house conservation and environment committee and the senate environment, conservation, and tourism committee by December 1, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 202; Title 68, Chapter 211 and Title 68, Chapter 212.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. E,C&T Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. E,C&T Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. E,C&T Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3245 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3126&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3126.pdf |