TN SB3066 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes body that fills vacancies on county and municipal school boards from the local legislative body to the local board of education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, changes body that fills vacancies on county and municipal school boards from the local legislative body to the local board of education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/05/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2759 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3066&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB3066.pdf |