TN SB2954 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee
Pending: Senate Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee
Pending: Senate Delayed Bills Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the manufacture, transfer, or purchase in this state of a detachable firearm ammunition magazine that is capable of storing and feeding more than 10 rounds of ammunition; a violation is subject to a civil penalty of up to $5,000; subjects to criminal forfeiture any magazines manufactured, transferred, or purchased in violation of this bill; grandfathers possession of magazines lawfully obtained prior to July 1, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 54; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 54; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 40, relative to ammunition magazines for firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate Delayed Bills Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1589 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.