TN SB2948 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 886
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 886
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises and clarifies various provisions of law related to probate matters. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 29; Title 30; Title 32; Title 33; Title 35 and Title 56.
Title
As enacted, revises and clarifies various provisions of law related to probate matters. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 29; Title 30; Title 32; Title 33; Title 35 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 886 | |
2012-04-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1211) | |
2012-04-18 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-16 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/18/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3237 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 886