TN SB2947 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/30/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/30/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 90 to 75 days period in which dealer via signed statement can deduct on a return sales tax collected but not yet remitted to commissioner for refunded items. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, reduces from 90 to 75 days period in which dealer via signed statement can deduct on a return sales tax collected but not yet remitted to commissioner for refunded items. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2921 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-28 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2947&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2947.pdf |