TN SB2944 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises property tax freeze income limit reference to the most recent decennial census to include reference to the American community survey five-year estimates released in the year following the most recent federal census. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-705.
Title
As introduced, revises property tax freeze income limit reference to the most recent decennial census to include reference to the American community survey five-year estimates released in the year following the most recent federal census. - Amends TCA Section 67-5-705.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/3/2010 | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3042 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2944&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2944.pdf |