TN SB2937 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pr. Ch. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pr. Ch. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, enacts the Sullivan County Financial Management System of 2020.
Title
Subject to local approval, enacts the Sullivan County Financial Management System of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pr. Ch. 46 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2933 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 46