TN SB2931 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, establishes the office of county attorney.
Title
AN ACT to establish the office of county attorney for Washington County.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 67 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/28/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2914 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 67