TN SB2930 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, sets the compensation for the juvenile court judge to equal the compensation of the Hawkins County general sessions judge; requires the juvenile court judge to serve in that capacity full time; prohibits the juvenile court judge from otherwise practicing law. - Amends Chapter 304 of the Private Acts of 1982; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 304 of the Private Acts of 1982; as amended by Chapter 74 of the Private Acts of 2008; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Hawkins County Juvenile Court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 66 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2913 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Pr. Ch. 66