TN SB2924 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows franchise and excise tax credit for donations to certain charitable organizations that provide scholarships to Tennessee residents to attend Tennessee nonpublic elementary and secondary schools. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, allows franchise and excise tax credit for donations to certain charitable organizations that provide scholarships to Tennessee residents to attend Tennessee nonpublic elementary and secondary schools. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3209 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-01 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Education
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2924&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2924.pdf |