TN SB2905 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 3, Nays 5 PNV 00
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 3, Nays 5 PNV 00
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires court of the judiciary to deliberate in public. - Amends TCA Title 17, Chapter 5, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires court of the judiciary to deliberate in public. - Amends TCA Title 17, Chapter 5, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 3, Nays 5 PNV 00 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/6/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2983 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-02 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD