TN SB2903 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a process for the majority and minority party caucuses of the general assembly to nominate candidates for United States senator. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 13, relative to selection of candidates for United States senator.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2948 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee