TN SB2898 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, for FY22-23, the state employer match to 200 percent of the amount contributed by each state employee to the state's 401(k) plan per month, up to a maximum of $100 per month; exempts from sales tax the retail sale of food and food ingredients sold between Monday, August 1, 2022, and Wednesday, August 31, 2022; makes additional statutory revisions required for implementation of the annual appropriations act. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 61; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 11; Title 12; Title 13; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 29; Title 33; Title 36; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 49; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 58; Title 59; Title 60; Title 61; Title 62; Title 63; Title 64; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71, relative to statutory revisions required for implementation of the annual appropriations act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 06/01/2022, 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1131 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0969) |
2022-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0967) |
2022-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0944) |
2022-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0943) |
2022-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30 Nays 0 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0938) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0936) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2883 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1131