TN SB2882 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to study the availability of affordable housing in this state and report its findings and recommendations to the general assembly no later than January 1, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 13, relative to affordable housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2955 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee