AL SB219 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Farm Center created, vested with powers and privileges, deemed economic development organization
Title
Alabama Farm Center created, vested with powers and privileges, deemed economic development organization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 586 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 585 Y3BC2N2-1 (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Roll Call 584 V3KNVVL-1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Roll Call 583 R3CKMMM-1 (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt - Roll Call 582 FXVGD5C-1 (Y: 8 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt - Roll Call 582 2CP3SSS-1 (Y: 8 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt - Roll Call 581 E6Z7222-1 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt - Roll Call 585 Y3BC2N2-1 (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Roll Call 584 V3KNVVL-1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Roll Call 583 R3CKMMM-1 (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt - Roll Call 582 FXVGD5C-1 (Y: 8 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt - Roll Call 582 2CP3SSS-1 (Y: 8 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt - Roll Call 581 E6Z7222-1 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-24 | House | Economic Development and Tourism 1st Substitute LB2JAYY-1 |
2024-04-18 | House | Pending House Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Lost Roll Call 582 2CP3SSS-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 586 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 585 Y3BC2N2-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 582 2CP3SSS-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coleman 1st Amendment Offered Y3BC2N2-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 584 V3KNVVL-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coleman-Madison 2nd Amendment Offered V3KNVVL-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 583 R3CKMMM-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coleman-Madison 1st Amendment Offered R3CKMMM-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt - Lost Roll Call 582 FXVGD5C-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Singleton 1st Substitute Offered FXVGD5C-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Shelnutt motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 581 E6Z7222-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry 1st Amendment Offered E6Z7222-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Carried Over |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry 1st Amendment Offered E6Z7222-1 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry 1st Amendment E6Z7222-1 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Pending Senate Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |