TN SB2880 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the Class B misdemeanor of parentage fraud. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 39, relative to parentage fraud.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2957 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Failed in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee