TN SB2873 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes the authorization for the state insurance committee to provide 80 percent of the scheduled premium or defined contribution for health insurance benefits to Tennessee highway patrol retirees with at least 25 years of service applicable to individuals retiring on or after January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 7; Title 8, Chapter 27 and Chapter 518 of the Public Acts of 2021.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 7; Title 8, Chapter 27 and Chapter 518 of the Public Acts of 2021, relative to health benefits for retired members of the Tennessee highway patrol.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2227 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee