TN SB2870 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Pub. Ch. 1151
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Pub. Ch. 1151
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes issuance of various new special license plates; extended time in which minimum order must be met for certain plates; revises other special license plate provisions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes issuance of various new special license plates; extended time in which minimum order must be met for certain plates; revises other special license plate provisions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - S. TRANS COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-16 | Pub. Ch. 1151 | |
2010-07-16 | Effective date(s) 07/05/10 | |
2010-07-08 | Returned by Governor without signature. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-08 | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA1616) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1404) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1403) | |
2010-06-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-05-27 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-05-24 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-05-24 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-24 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1423) | |
2010-05-24 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1388) | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Rec. for passage. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2896 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1151