TN SB2864 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 30 to 45 days the period of public notice required for an annual public hearing to examine and evaluate the use of judicial commissioners in any county with a population greater than 700,000 and that appoints and makes use of judicial commissioners. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 33; Title 36 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 33; Title 36 and Title 40, relative to judicial commissioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2444 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.