TN SB2855 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Effective date(s) 05/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates one additional circuit court in the 23rd judicial district. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 2, relative to judicial districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Effective date(s) 05/01/2024 | |
2024-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 880 | |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1830 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 880