TN SB2851 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 606
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 606
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, names segment of U.S. 27 in Rhea County in honor of the late Hiram Green.
Title
As enacted, names segment of U.S. 27 in Rhea County in honor of the late Hiram Green.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 606 | |
2012-03-12 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/12/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3010 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 606