TN SB2847 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1018
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1018
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes board to grant reciprocity to a person licensed and employed as a funeral director or embalmer in another state for five years; specifies requirements for nonresident applicants. - Amends TCA Section 62-5-311.
Title
As enacted, authorizes board to grant reciprocity to a person licensed and employed as a funeral director or embalmer in another state for five years; specifies requirements for nonresident applicants. - Amends TCA Section 62-5-311.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1018 | |
2010-05-06 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - SA1342) | |
2010-05-06 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA1023) | |
2010-05-06 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1010) | |
2010-05-06 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0867) | |
2010-05-06 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/6/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-22 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/29/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/22/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/22/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/08/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/8/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to FW&M Comm Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3480 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1018