RI S2400 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-29 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FOOD AND DRUGS -- WHOLESALE PRESCRIPTION DRUG IMPORTATION PROGRAM - Establishes the Wholesale Prescription Drug Importation Program for the importation of wholesale prescription drugs from Canada to provide savings to Rhode Island consumers.
Title
Establishes the Wholesale Prescription Drug Importation Program for the importation of wholesale prescription drugs from Canada to provide savings to Rhode Island consumers.
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/28/2024) |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |