TN SB2830 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that the public records of a criminal defendant sentenced on or after July 1, 2020, are automatically expunged if the defendant has fulfilled the requirements for expunction by petitioning the court. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As introduced, provides that the public records of a criminal defendant sentenced on or after July 1, 2020, are automatically expunged if the defendant has fulfilled the requirements for expunction by petitioning the court. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2901 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee