TN SB2821 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 751
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds provisions governing the apportionment and distribution of incremental increases in sales and use taxes due to a public use facility. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 30.
Title
As enacted, adds provisions governing the apportionment and distribution of incremental increases in sales and use taxes due to a public use facility. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 88 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 30.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Pub. Ch. 751 | |
2020-07-02 | Effective date(s) 06/22/2020 | |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2020-06-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0811) |
2020-06-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-06-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0680) |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Recalled from Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2106 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 751